NV SB276 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 495.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 495.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing medical marijuana establishments. (BDR S-996)
Title
Revises provisions governing medical marijuana establishments. (BDR S-996)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 495. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 948.) To printer. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 864.) To printer. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Notice of withdrawal on next legislative day. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |