NV SB273 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-04 - In Senate. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to higher education; changing the name of the Nevada State College to the Nevada State University; designating the Nevada State University as a state college; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the name of the Nevada State College to the Nevada State University. (BDR 34-968)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-04SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-30AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-30AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-05-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2023-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2023-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-05-18SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) To printer.
2023-05-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-04-06SenateExemption effective.
2023-04-06SenateTaken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2023-04-06SenateRead second time.
2023-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-03-20SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2023-03-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback