NV SB272 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to governmental administration; requiring a state agency or local government to post certain information on its Internet website relating to certain purchasing contracts, performance contracts and contracts for public works; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to governmental administration. (BDR 27-876)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16SenateVetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
2023-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-06-04SenateAssembly Amendment No. 628 concurred in. To enrollment.
2023-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2023-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
2023-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-05-23AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 628.) To printer.
2023-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-04-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2023-04-21AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2023-04-19SenateRead second time.
2023-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-03-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback