NV SB272 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Exemption effective.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System; requiring the State of Nevada to pay to the System the employees' portion of contributions for certain employees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System. (BDR 23-749)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2019-04-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback