NV SB271 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to discriminatory practices; establishing certain requirements relating to attorneys and paralegals who provide services to or are employed by the Nevada Equal Rights Commission within the Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation; establishing certain requirements relating to a complaint alleging an unlawful discriminatory practice in employment; setting forth certain requirements relating to the final disposition of a complaint alleging an unlawful discriminatory practice; revising certain duties of the Commission; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to discrimination. (BDR 18-2)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/10117/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB271.pdf |