NV SB27 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; authorizing the Superintendent of Public Instruction to investigate persons subject to his or her jurisdiction; revising the membership of the Commission on Professional Standards in Education; revising requirements related to certain reports relating to local school precincts; authorizing the State Board of Education to delegate authority to suspend or revoke a license to the Department of Education; revising provisions relating to the Teach Nevada Scholarship Program; revising provisions relating to the policy for parental involvement required by federal law; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises various provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-326)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 680 and 761.) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 7.) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |