NV SB27 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 172.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 172.
Summary
Revises provisions relating to motor carriers. (BDR 58-436)
Title
Revises provisions relating to motor carriers. (BDR 58-436)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 172. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-03-05 | In Assembly. | |
2009-03-04 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-02-26 | Read second time. | |
2009-02-25 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=54 |