NV SB267 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 213.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring the identification of social and environmental factors that affect the educational experience of pupils at each public school; requiring the consideration of those factors in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes revisions concerning the effect of social and environmental factors on education. (BDR 34-578)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateChapter 213.
2019-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-24SenateAssembly Amendment No. 783 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 783.) To printer.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-11SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 168.) To printer.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-13SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-12SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback