NV SB264 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 79. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to collective bargaining; revising the provisions relating to the authority of a civilian employee of a metropolitan police department to be a member of an employee organization; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to collective bargaining. (BDR 23-932)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 79. (Effective October 1, 2023)
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-19AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2023-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2023-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 162.) To printer.
2023-04-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback