NV SB259 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to driving under the influence of alcohol or a controlled substance. (BDR 43-606)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to driving under the influence of alcohol or a controlled substance. (BDR 43-606)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 564.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateTo enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateConcur in Assembly Amendment No. 948.
2017-06-05SenateAction of refusal of concurrence rescinded.
2017-06-05SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2017-06-05SenateAppointment of Conference Committee rescinded.
2017-06-04SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 948 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 948 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-26AssemblyTo printer.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2017-05-26AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 948.)
2017-05-26AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 167.) To printer.
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback