NV SB259 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an employer to provide paid sick leave to each employee of the employer under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-973)
Title
Requires an employer to provide paid sick leave to each employee of the employer under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-973)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-11 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |