NV SB258 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to applied behavior analysis; abolishing certification as a state certified behavior interventionist; transferring certain responsibilities concerning licensing and regulation from the Aging and Disability Services Division of the Department of Health and Human Services to the Board of Applied Behavior Analysis; authorizing the Board to delegate certain such responsibilities to the Division; requiring the Division to obtain the approval of the Board to conduct an investigation and perform certain related tasks; revising provisions exempting certain persons from licensure or registration to practice applied behavior analysis; requiring continuing education for behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts to meet nationally recognized standards; revising provisions relating to criminal background checks or applicants for registration as a registered behavior technician; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to applied behavior analysis. (BDR 39-248)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 410. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 734 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 734.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 163.) To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |