NV SB257 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to child care facilities. (BDR 38-97)
Title
Revises provisions relating to child care facilities. (BDR 38-97)
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] | Sen. Ruben Kihuen [D] | Sen. Mark Manendo [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 847.) To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 393.) To printer. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |