NV SB256 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to housing; revising provisions relating to the return of security deposits; limiting the amount of fees for late rent; revising provisions relating to the recovery of damages by a tenant for a landlord's failure to maintain a dwelling unit in a habitable condition; requiring a landlord to allow a former tenant to retrieve essential personal effects and establishing an expedited procedure if a landlord acts unreasonably under such circumstances; authorizing a tenant to take certain actions if a landlord abuses the right of access to a dwelling unit or uses that right to harass the tenant; making various other changes to provisions relating to housing; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises various provisions relating to landlords and tenants. (BDR 10-569)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 612.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-12SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-11SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback