NV SB254 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 214.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 214.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to ethical standards in real estate transactions. (BDR 1-31)
Title
Makes various changes relating to ethical standards in real estate transactions. (BDR 1-31)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 214. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=695 |