NV SB253 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-22 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-22 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alarm systems; prohibiting, under certain circumstances, the governing body of a county or city from imposing a penalty, fine or fee on an alarm system contractor or monitoring company; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to alarm systems. (BDR 20-968)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-22 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 385.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |