NV SB251 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to property; directing the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning the development of residential golf courses; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires an interim study concerning the development of certain golf courses. (BDR S-60)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-22SenateNotice of exemption.
2019-04-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 360.) To printer.
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-06SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-05SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback