NV SB251 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 263.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 263.
Summary
Revises certain provisions governing vehicles. (BDR 43-1115)
Title
Revises certain provisions governing vehicles. (BDR 43-1115)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 263. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Assembly Amendment No. 744 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-16 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 501.) To printer. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. | |
2009-04-09 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-08 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 144.) To printer. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=690 |