NV SB248 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to pupils with disabilities. (BDR 34-328)
Title
Revises provisions relating to pupils with disabilities. (BDR 34-328)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=576 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB248.pdf |