NV SB244 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to historic preservation. (BDR 33-515)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to historic preservation. (BDR 33-515)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 523.
2017-06-05SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 6, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-01AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateTo printer.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1003.)
2017-05-31SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Secretary's desk.
2017-05-30SenateTo printer.
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Secretary's desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 965.)
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 309.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-08SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-07SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback