NV SB244 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing special license plates and parking placards for persons with disabilities. (BDR 43-656)
Title
Revises provisions governing special license plates and parking placards for persons with disabilities. (BDR 43-656)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-05-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2011-05-17 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-11 | Notice of exemption. | |
2011-04-07 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-04-07 | Taken from General File. | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |