NV SB241 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the establishment of the State Seal of STEM Program and the State Seal of STEAM Program. (BDR 34-680)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the establishment of the State Seal of STEM Program and the State Seal of STEAM Program. (BDR 34-680)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-17SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-15AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 116.) To printer.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-08SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-07SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback