NV SB239 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring the interests of a victim of reported bullying or cyber-bullying to be given priority in certain circumstances; authorizing the extension of the time required to conduct an investigation into reported cyber-bullying in certain circumstances; making various other changes to provisions relating to bullying in schools; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to bullying in schools. (BDR 34-641)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateChapter 232.
2019-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2019-04-18AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-17SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-17SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 213.) To printer.
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback