NV SB239 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 417.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 417.
Summary
Provides for greater coordination of Nevada's economic development and workforce development goals. (BDR 18-1080)
Title
Provides for greater coordination of Nevada's economic development and workforce development goals. (BDR 18-1080)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 417. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 920 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-23 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-23 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-23 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Not voting: 2.) | |
2009-05-22 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-22 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 920.) | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 317.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=652 |