NV SB235 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 598.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the regulation of ticket sales to an athletic contest or live entertainment event in certain circumstances. (BDR 52-672)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the regulation of ticket sales to an athletic contest or live entertainment event in certain circumstances. (BDR 52-672)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 598.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 1149 and 1163 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-05AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1163.)
2017-06-05AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-05AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-06-05AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1149.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateTo printer.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.)
2017-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 945 and 1051.)
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 374.)
2017-04-24SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-03-07SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-06SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback