NV SB233 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation for allocation to the Nevada Health Service Corps to obtain matching federal money for the purpose of encouraging certain medical and dental practitioners to practice in underserved areas; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation relating to health services in underserved areas. (BDR S-931)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |