NV SB230 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to real estate; revising provisions relating to advertisements by real estate licensees; revising educational requirements which must be satisfied by an applicant for licensure as a real estate salesperson, real estate broker or real estate broker-salesperson; revising provisions governing the maintenance of certain licenses by real estate brokers and owner-developers; revising provisions governing certain regulations of the Real Estate Commission relating to the curriculum and subject matter of continuing education; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain real estate professions. (BDR 54-311)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 440. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 898 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 898.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 521.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |