NV SB230 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to judgments. (BDR 2-512)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to judgments. (BDR 2-512)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-03SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
2017-05-29SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 7, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-24AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-04-17SenateRead second time.
2017-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-03-01SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback