NV SB227 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Department of Education to prescribe a template for reporting information about expenditures by public schools; requiring the Department to publish a description of the personnel and services that a public school may employ and provide with the amount budgeted for the public school; requiring each public school to report certain information prescribed by the Department relating to expenditures by the public school; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain information to be reported concerning public school expenditures. (BDR 34-825)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-03-18SenateNotice of exemption.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback