NV SB227 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the financial administration of the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry. (BDR 54-982)
Title
Revises provisions governing the financial administration of the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry. (BDR 54-982)
Sponsors
Sen. John Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-06-06 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-05 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 867.) To printer. | |
2011-06-05 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-27 | To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 196.) | |
2011-04-26 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-10 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |