NV SB226 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health insurance; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to enter into agreements to purchase prescription drugs on behalf of certain health benefit plans; authorizing the Department to enter into agreements to purchase other goods or services on behalf of such health benefit plans; replacing the Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee with the Silver State Scripts Advisory Board; requiring certain insurers to participate in a system that rates health care plans; requiring an insurer to allow an insured to credit certain amounts toward any copay or coinsurance for a prescription drug; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to health insurance. (BDR 38-549)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6372/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB226.pdf |