NV SB225 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 90.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 90.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; requiring the Director of the Department of Veterans Services to submit to the Interim Finance Committee an annual report detailing expenditures made from the Account to Assist Veterans Who Have Suffered Sexual Trauma; authorizing veterans who experienced an act of sexual assault to obtain compensation from the Fund for the Compensation of Victims of Crime; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to veterans. (BDR 37-552)
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] |
Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 90. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 658 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 658.) To printer. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |