NV SB224 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public retirement systems; providing for the confidentiality of certain information; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public retirement systems. (BDR 23-598)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 212. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 832 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 16, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 832.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 430.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |