NV SB223 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to real property; revising certain requirements for the recording of a notice of pendency of an action affecting real property; revising provisions relating to landlords and tenants; revising certain requirements for the sale of real property pursuant to the power of sale under a deed of trust; revising certain definitions; revising requirements for the recording of certain instruments; clarifying the circumstances under which certain claims of a real estate broker are satisfied; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to real property. (BDR 2-657)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 118. (Effective July 1, 2023)
2023-05-26SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-05-22AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2023-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2023-04-17SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2023-04-10SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2023-04-06SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-04SenateRead second time.
2023-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-03-08SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-07SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback