NV SB219 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to radiation. (BDR 40-889)
Title
Revises provisions relating to radiation. (BDR 40-889)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 624.) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 155.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |