NV SB216 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to persons with disabilities; requiring agencies that oversee programs that provide services to persons with autism spectrum disorders to report certain information concerning such programs to the Commission; establishing the Nevada Commission on Autism Spectrum Disorders to review data and information and advise the Governor regarding the needs of persons with autism spectrum disorders and their families; revising the required contents of a plan of treatment for a participant in the Autism Treatment Assistance Program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to autism spectrum disorders. (BDR 38-33)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 509. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 106.) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |