NV SB215 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 548.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 548.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to occupational diseases; revising provisions governing compensation for certain employees who develop cancer as an occupational disease; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to occupational diseases. (BDR 53-317)
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] |
Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 548. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1040.) |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 478.) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |