NV SB212 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 460.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 460.
Summary
Revises provisions governing initiative petitions. (BDR 24-649)
Title
Revises provisions governing initiative petitions. (BDR 24-649)
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Rhoads [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 460. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-01 | Assembly Amendment No. 1002 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | In Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | To Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-06-01 | To printer. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) | |
2009-06-01 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1002.) | |
2009-06-01 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-31 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee. | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | To printer. | |
2009-05-31 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) | |
2009-05-31 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-31 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2009-05-31 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 984 and 996.) | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-31 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=597 |