NV SB206 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires legislative lobbyists to file reports concerning lobbying activities when the Legislature is not in session. (BDR 17-1004)
Title
Requires legislative lobbyists to file reports concerning lobbying activities when the Legislature is not in session. (BDR 17-1004)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-05-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2011-05-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-08 | EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a). | |
2011-03-02 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |