NV SB204 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 297.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mental health; requiring a policy for the prevention of suicide to be adopted for each public and private school in this State; requiring certain plans and outreach to address the needs of pupils who are at a high risk of suicide; requiring the Department of Education to adopt a model policy for responding to suicides; requiring a plan for response to a crisis, emergency or suicide at a school to include certain provisions related to suicide response and intervention; requiring all pupils and school staff to receive training in the prevention of suicide; requiring a course in health to include instruction concerning mental health; revising the contents of certain suicide prevention training provided to certain law enforcement agencies; authorizing the denial or revocation of a license to operate a private school for failure to adopt such a policy; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the mental health of pupils. (BDR 34-551)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 297.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 9, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2019-04-17SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-17SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-16SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 285.)
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback