NV SB204 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 240.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to investigate and establish biennial targets for certain electric utilities to procure energy storage systems under certain circumstances. (BDR 58-642)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to investigate and establish biennial targets for certain electric utilities to procure energy storage systems under certain circumstances. (BDR 58-642)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 240.
2017-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 572.) To printer.
2017-04-21SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-23SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback