NV SB203 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to civil actions; revising provisions relating to civil actions involving certain sexual offenses; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to civil actions involving certain sexual offenses. (BDR 2-577)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-25SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 602 and 687 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Absent: 1.) To Senate.
2021-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2021-05-19AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 687.) To printer.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 602.) To printer.
2021-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2021-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 355.) To printer.
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-10SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7650/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB203.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB203_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB203_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB203_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB203_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB203_355.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB203_R1_602.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB203_R2_687.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7310&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7731&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments 750

feedback