NV SB203 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to domestic corporations. (BDR 7-71)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to domestic corporations. (BDR 7-71)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 559.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 699.) To printer.
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13SenateWaiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.
2017-02-23SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback