NV SB201 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 501.
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 501.
Summary
Authorizes certain counties to impose additional taxes on fuels for motor vehicles. (BDR 32-233)
Title
Authorizes certain counties to impose additional taxes on fuels for motor vehicles. (BDR 32-233)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Chapter 501. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-06-01 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | To Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Not voting: 1.) | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) | |
2009-05-30 | Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, May 30, 2009, at 6:42 p.m. | |
2009-05-26 | Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. | |
2009-05-21 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-16 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-15 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-05-08 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-05 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-04 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-02 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-13 | Waiver granted effective: April 3, 2009. | |
2009-03-12 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=568 |