NV SB20 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 223.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 223.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to guardianships; enacting certain provisions of the Uniform Guardianship, Conservatorship, and Other Protective Arrangements Act; authorizing the filing of a petition for an expedited hearing to transfer a proposed protected person from a health care facility to another health care facility that provides a less restrictive level of care in certain circumstances; revising various provisions relating to guardianships; increasing the additional fee charged by county recorders to allocate additional money for legal representation for protected persons, proposed protected persons, protected minors and proposed protected minors in guardianship proceedings; authorizing a portion of such a fee to be used to pay for certain assistance to protected minors and proposed protected minors in guardianship proceedings; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to guardianships. (BDR 13-493)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 223. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 669 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 1, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 669.) To printer. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 75.) To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |