NV SB195 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to virtual currency; enacting the Uniform Regulation of Virtual-Currency Businesses Act; enacting the Uniform Supplemental Commercial Law for the Uniform Regulation of Virtual-Currency Businesses Act; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts the Uniform Regulation of Virtual-Currency Businesses Act and the Uniform Supplemental Commercial Law for the Uniform Regulation of Virtual-Currency Businesses Act. (BDR 59-594)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6337/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB195.pdf |