NV SB195 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 375.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to higher education. (BDR 34-509)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to higher education. (BDR 34-509)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 375.
2015-06-03SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31SenateTo enrollment.
2015-05-31SenateAssembly Amendment No. 951 concurred in.
2015-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-30AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 951.) To printer.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-05-15AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2015-05-01AssemblyTo committee.
2015-05-01AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-05-01AssemblyTaken from General File.
2015-05-01AssemblyRead second time.
2015-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2015-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 508.) To printer.
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback