NV SB194 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; establishing a State Seal of Civics Program; requiring the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish criteria for certain designations related to civics; requiring a public high school to report certain test results to the Department of Education; requiring instruction provided in social studies to include civics; requiring that various communities be included in the standards of content and performance for ethnic and diversity studies; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-676)
Sponsors
Sen. Roberta Lange [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Fabian Donate [D] | Sen. Scott Hammond [R] |
Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 327. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 828 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 828.) To printer. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |