NV SB194 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public assistance; requiring the Office of the State Treasurer to establish the Individual Development Account Program under which certain persons may establish an individual development account; establishing a credit against the modified business tax for certain taxpayers or other persons; creating the Nevada Statewide Council on Financial Independence; prohibiting certain entities from considering money deposited into an individual development account by certain persons to be income under certain circumstances; requiring certain entities to ensure that instruction in financial literacy is provided to certain persons; requiring the State Treasurer to ensure that certain instruction and training is provided to a tenant of a housing project; authorizing the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to waive certain fees and tuition for certain children placed in foster homes or in the custody of an agency which provides child welfare services; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes programs for certain persons of low-income and persons in foster care. (BDR 38-780)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-19SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 522.)
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-05SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback