NV SB190 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415.
Summary
Revises provisions regarding the acquisition and disposal of real property by fair and recreation boards in certain larger counties. (BDR 20-648)
Title
Revises provisions regarding the acquisition and disposal of real property by fair and recreation boards in certain larger counties. (BDR 20-648)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 668 and 916 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-23 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-23 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-23 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) | |
2009-05-22 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 916.) | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-22 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-21 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-21 | Action reconsidered. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Notice of reconsideration on next legislative day. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2009-05-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-20 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 668.) | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 74.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-11 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=541 |